This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 17:45:43 (UTC).

Miller vs. Neiman

Case Summary

On 04/28/2011 Miller filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Neiman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************6307

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Miller, Dana S

Miller, Richard E

Defendant

Neiman, Nannette

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

04/28/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

04/28/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

04/28/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

04/28/2011: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

04/28/2011: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Proof of Service

05/09/2011: Proof of Service

Defendant's Claim and Order to Plaintiff

06/09/2011: Defendant's Claim and Order to Plaintiff

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

06/09/2011: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

SC120 Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

06/09/2011: SC120 Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service

06/15/2011: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

06/15/2011: Proof of Service

Minute Order

07/07/2011: Minute Order

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

07/07/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

07/07/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

07/13/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

07/13/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DocketCase status updated to Post Judgment effective 08/12/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 95 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 75 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Judgment contested. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court disposed with disposition of Judgment contested. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketStatus of Dana Miller updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketStatus of Richard Miller updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketSan Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketSC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketMiller, Dana S, Miller, Richard E Application for Waiver granted in full on 04/28/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketMiller, Dana S, Miller, Richard E Application for Waiver granted in full on 04/28/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Miller, Dana S; Miller, Richard E on 04/28/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - Principal 1320.00 plus costs 30.00 (FW) scheduled for 07/07/2011 at 01:30:00 PM in 17 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 17. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Miller, Dana S on 04/28/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Miller, Dana S on 04/28/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less