Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:30:31 (UTC).

Mildred Marie Mitchell vs Doyle Garden Apartments et al.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 Mildred Marie Mitchell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Doyle Garden Apartments. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0180

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitchell, Mildred Marie

Defendants

Nijjar Realty, Inc

Doyle Garden Apartments

PAMA Management, Inc

SPSSM Investments, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eacret, Gene B

Sinclair, Spencer Douglas

Defendant Attorney

Finch, Steven

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice of Further Case Management Conference filed by Doyle Garden Apartments; Nijjar Realty, Inc; PAMA Management, Inc. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MC052 Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/15/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Nijjar Realty, Inc; PAMA Management, Inc; SPSSM Investments, LP. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Defendants SPSSM Investments, L.P. Pama Management, Inc., and Nijjar Realty Inc. Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by PAMA Management, Inc; Nijjar Realty, Inc; SPSSM Investments, LP. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Nijjar Realty, Inc served on 07/11/2017 by Substituted Service. $35.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to PAMA Management, Inc served on 07/11/2017 by Substituted Service. $35.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Doyle Garden Apartments. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel held on 04/17/2018 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by PAMA Management, Inc; Nijjar Realty, Inc; Doyle Garden Apartments. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to SPSSM Investments, LP served on 07/11/2017 by Substituted Service. $125.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Mildred Marie Mitchell, Doyle Garden Apartments, SPSSM Investments, LP, PAMA Management, Inc, Nijjar Realty, Inc Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Case status updated to Conditional Settlement. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 10/18/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment, set for 08/05/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/05/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/05/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Attorney, Gene B Eacret, retained for Mildred Marie Mitchell . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mitchell, Mildred Marie. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Payment received by Mildred Mitchell in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 132020. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPSSM Investments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PAMA MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NIJJAR REALTY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven H Finch