This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/06/2021 at 03:35:16 (UTC).

Miguel Vergara vs Smart & Final LLC

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Miguel Vergara filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Smart Final LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger and Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9496

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vergara, Miguel

Defendant

Smart & Final LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrillo, Rafael

Defendant Attorney

Aldrich, Theodore F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vergara, Miguel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vergara, Miguel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

03/04/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 04/20/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/08/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Answer

Answer to Complaint ---------------------------------------- First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Smart & Final LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice

Notice of Demand for Jury Trial and Deposit of Advance Jury Fees filed by Smart & Final LLC. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Smart & Final LLC served on 07/09/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Smart & Final LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Miguel Vergara (Plaintiff); Participant: Smart & Final LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Smart & Final LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Demand for Jury Trial and Deposit of Advance Jury Fees filed by Smart & Final LLC. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint ---------------------------------------- First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Smart & Final LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Smart & Final LLC in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 666068. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Theodore F. Aldrich, retained for Smart & Final LLC . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Smart & Final LLC served on 07/09/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Miguel Vergara (Plaintiff); Participant: Smart & Final LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/08/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/24/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on April 20, 2021. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/20/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vergara, Miguel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vergara, Miguel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Miguel Vergara in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 599584. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Rafael Carrillo, retained for Miguel Vergara . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALDRICH, THEODORE F.