This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/02/2023 at 12:27:22 (UTC).

Miguel Martinez vs Maria Fernanda Gonzalez-Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Miguel Martinez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Maria Fernanda Gonzalez-Gonzalez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0118

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Martinez, Miguel

Respondent

Gonzalez-Gonzalez, Maria Fernanda

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

02/06/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Maria Fernanda Gonzalez-Gonzalez filed. Served on 01/28/2023. Method of Service: Personal Service; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Miguel Martinez.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA) filed by Martinez, Miguel.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Martinez, Miguel.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Martinez, Miguel.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less