This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/17/2020 at 01:12:32 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Scott Sherman

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Scott Sherman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2274

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Sherman, Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siduguen, Christine S.

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Scott Sherman served on 11/21/2019 by Personal Service. $95.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Scott Sherman served on 11/21/2019 by Personal Service. $95.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Midland Funding LLC in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 474148. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Christine S. Siduguen, retained for Midland Funding LLC . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.