This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:52:36 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Refugio Iniguez

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Refugio Iniguez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1976

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Iniguez, Refugio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fraser, Deanna

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Entire Action With Prejudice filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Refugio Iniguez served on 03/29/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $68.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration of Reduction of Fees

Declaration Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2016
  • Case status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Midland Funding LLC, Refugio Iniguez Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Entire Action With Prejudice filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Refugio Iniguez served on 03/29/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $68.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Deanna Fraser, retained for Midland Funding LLC . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 35149. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less