This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:54:08 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Paula Oneal

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Paula Oneal. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1994

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Oneal, Paula

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gabrielova, Kristy

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 06/20/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 08/04/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 05/23/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Midland Funding LLC, Paula Oneal Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 05/23/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 06/20/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1

Declaration in Support of Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Bus & Pro Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Paula Oneal served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $68.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 09/08/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Midland Funding LLC, Paula Oneal Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 08/04/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 09/08/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Hearing Result: Reset - Court's Motion Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 06/20/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/04/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on June 20, 2017. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Paula Oneal served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $68.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Kristy Gabrielova, retained for Midland Funding LLC . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 35273. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Bus & Pro Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less