This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/02/2020 at 05:13:31 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Marianne Lincoln

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marianne Lincoln. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2320

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Lincoln, Marianne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mandarich, Christopher D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Fee Waiver Payment Plan Notice

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Payment Plan as to Marianne Lincoln. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Marianne Lincoln served on 09/27/2019 by Personal Service. $95.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/22/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Ross, Roger.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer filed by Lincoln, Marianne. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (case filed by assignee within small claims jurisdictional limit, with declaration); Judge: Ross, Roger.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Payment Plan as to Marianne Lincoln. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Payment Plan as to Marianne Lincoln. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • Payment received in the amount of $60.00, receipt number 516713. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Payment received in the amount of $61.00, receipt number 505655. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/22/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Lincoln, Marianne. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (case filed by assignee within small claims jurisdictional limit, with declaration); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Payment Plan as to Marianne Lincoln. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Lincoln, Marianne. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Marianne Lincoln served on 09/27/2019 by Personal Service. $95.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Payment received by Midland Funding LLC in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 474550. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Attorney, Christopher D Mandarich, retained for Midland Funding LLC . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.