This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:52:51 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Elias Avila

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Elias Avila. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1979

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Avila, Elias

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Graves, Mishaela J

 

Court Documents

Declaration Reduction in Filing Fee

Declaration Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Elias Avila served on 04/12/2016. Type of Service Personal. $68.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with prejudice- Entire Action as to Midland Funding LLC, Elias Avila Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2016
  • Case status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice- Entire Action as to Midland Funding LLC, Elias Avila Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Elias Avila served on 04/12/2016. Type of Service Personal. $68.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 35162. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Mishaela J Graves, retained for Midland Funding LLC . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less