This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:52:31 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Albert Thomas

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Albert Thomas. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1975

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Thomas, Albert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Graves, Mishaela J

 

Court Documents

Declaration

Declaration of Non Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration

Declaration of Non Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice - Entire Action as to Midland Funding LLC, Albert Thomas Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration of Non Service

Declaration of Non Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2016
  • Case status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice - Entire Action as to Midland Funding LLC, Albert Thomas Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Mishaela J Graves, retained for Midland Funding LLC . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 35139. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less