This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/11/2023 at 09:05:33 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Jody S Harter

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jody S Harter. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0598

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Defendant

Harter, Jody S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kahn, Michael Douglass

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint by Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1

Declaration Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

Declaration of Venue

Declaration Pursuant to CCP Section 395 (b); Venue for Personal, Family of Household Obligations filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jody S Harter served on 02/14/2023 by Substituted Service. $65.00.

 

Docket Entries

05/25/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Court Judgment filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Jody S Harter served on 02/14/2023 by Substituted Service. $65.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Pursuant to CCP Section 395 (b); Venue for Personal, Family of Household Obligations filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Inc. Midland Credit Management in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 806421.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Michael Douglass Kahn, retained for Midland Credit Management, Inc. .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less