This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 04:11:20 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Christopher M Herriage

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christopher M Herriage. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0613

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint by Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1

Declaration Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration Pursuant to CCP Section 395 (b); Venue for Personal, Family or Household Obligations filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Christopher M Herriage served on 02/08/2023 by Substituted Service. $65.00.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Christopher M Herriage Entered.

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Christopher M Herriage Entered.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Christopher M Herriage served on 02/08/2023 by Substituted Service. $65.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023

DocketPayment received in the amount of $181.00, receipt number 806495.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023

DocketAssessed $181.00 Civil Costs on Plaintiff, Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Pursuant to CCP Section 395 (b); Venue for Personal, Family or Household Obligations filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Re: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Inc. Midland Credit Management in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 806491.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Michael Douglass Kahn, retained for Midland Credit Management, Inc. .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less