This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 15:31:30 (UTC).

Michelle Machado vs Nicholas Machado

Case Summary

On 02/09/2017 Michelle Machado filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Nicholas Machado. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0708

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Machado, Michelle

Respondent

Machado, Nicholas

Not Classified By Court

Troop - 2016, Shelly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • Payment received in the amount of $50.00, receipt number 244819. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Assessed $50.00 Civil Costs on Petitioner, Machado, Michelle Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Order for Change of Venue to Alameda County Granted and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • CORRECTED Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Michelle Machado, Nicholas Machado Entered. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Machado, Michelle. Action Type: Proof of Substitute Service; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Michelle Machado, Nicholas Machado Entered. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 12/18/2017 03:57 PM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Hearing re: Review held on December 15, 2017. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Modification held on December 15, 2017. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Review held on 12/15/2017 08:15 AM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address filed by Machado, Michelle. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Restraining Order After Hearing Granted. Expires on 03/03/2018 . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Restraining Order After Hearing Granted. Expires on 03/03/2018. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Michelle Machado. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Machado, Michelle. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Machado, Michelle. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Machado, Michelle . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Machado, Michelle. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less