This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 08:27:54 (UTC).

Michelle Chavez-Miller et al. vs The Islander Tavern et al.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 Michelle Chavez-Miller filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Islander Tavern. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0848

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chavez-Miller, Michelle

Defendants and Cross Defendants

The Islander Tavern

The Islander Mobile Home Park

Hogan, Richard

Hartman, Melody

Torres, Russell

The Islander Mobile Home Park (#2)

Volpatti Insurance, Inc. - (#2)

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

The Islander Mobile Home Park

The Islander Tavern (#2)

Richard Hogan (#2),

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arends, John

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Sodhi, Jakrun S.

Faircloth, Michael S

 

Court Documents

Amended Answer

Cross-Defendant The Islander Tavern First Amended Answer to the Cross-complaint of The Islander Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer to Cross Complaint

Cross Defendant the Islander Tavern and Richard Hogan's Answer to the Cross-Complaint of the Islander Mobile Home Park First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Hogan, Richard; The Islander Tavern. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Order

Amendment to Complaint (Order Required) filed by Michelle Chavez-Miller. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service of Statement of Damages filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Cross-Complaint

Defendant The Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC'S Cross-Complaint Against The Islander Tavern filed by The Islander Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to The Islander Mobile Home Park served on 11/14/2017 by Substituted Service. $135.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hogan, Richard; Hogan, Richard; The Islander Tavern. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 04/17/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice to Filing Party

04/04/2018: Notice to Filing Party

Amendment to Cross-Complaint

Roe Amendment to Cross-Complaint of The Islander Mobile Hoe Park,LLC filed by The Islander Mobile Home Park; The Islander Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to The Islander Mobile Home Park filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. (DUPLICATE) Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to First Amended Complaint filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to The Islander Tavern served on 11/13/2017 by Substituted Service. $135.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment, set for 09/30/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 09/16/2019 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on August 22, 2018. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 08/22/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Russell Torres Entered Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Hogan, Richard; Hogan, Richard; The Islander Tavern. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hogan, Richard; Hogan, Richard. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Attorney, Jakrun S. Sodhi, retained for Richard Hogan . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to The Islander Tavern served on 11/13/2017 by Substituted Service. $135.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • First Amended Complaint filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Attorney, John Arends retained for Michelle Chavez-Miller . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/17/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Payment received by Michelle Chavez-Miller in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 222627. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Chavez-Miller, Michelle. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Islander Mobile Home Park, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAIRCLOTH MICHAEL S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sodhi, Jakrun S.