This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/07/2023 at 02:06:06 (UTC).

Michaela J. Salas vs Nathan Alan Shawver

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Michaela J Salas filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Nathan Alan Shawver. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez, Danielle Y.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6086

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez, Danielle Y.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Salas, Michaela J.

Respondent

Shawver, Nathan Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Court Room: 4B; Result: Held; Judge: Danielle Y. Ramirez; Participants; Michaela J. Salas (Petitioner); Nathan Alan Shawver (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing Granted. Expires on 01/04/2024.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on January 4, 2023.; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on 01/04/2023 08:15 AM .; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of DV-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing as to Nathan Alan Shawver served on 12/14/2022 by Mailing. .; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Court Room: 4B; Result: Held; Judge: Danielle Y. Ramirez; Participants; Michaela J. Salas (Petitioner); Nathan Alan Shawver (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Michaela J. Salas.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Michaela Salas), set for 01/04/2023 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on December 13, 2022.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on 12/13/2022 08:15 AM .; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of TRO as to Nathan Alan Shawver served on 11/26/2022 by Personal Service. .; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 11/22/2022.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Michaela J. Salas.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Michaela Salas) *No POS*, set for 12/13/2022 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Ex Parte Application.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order filed by Salas, Michaela J..; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less