This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 10:47:36 (UTC).

Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr. et al. vs Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2615

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mitchell, Donna Rae

Riball, Isabel

Riball, Edmond

Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr.

Defendant

Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jones, Colin

Defendant Attorney

Cholakian, Kevin K.

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/23/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr.; Riball, Edmond; Mitchell, Donna Rae. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Answer

Defendant Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport's Answer To Complaint filed by Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity served on 04/05/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mitchell, Donna Rae; Riball, Edmond; Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr.; Riball, Isabel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mitchell, Donna Rae; Riball, Edmond; Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr.; Riball, Isabel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Donna Rae Mitchell (Plaintiff); Participant: Edmond Riball (Plaintiff); Participant: Isabel Riball (Plaintiff); Participant: Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr. (Plaintiff); Participant: Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Donna Rae Mitchell (Plaintiff); Participant: Edmond Riball (Plaintiff); Participant: Isabel Riball (Plaintiff); Participant: Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr. (Plaintiff); Participant: Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference Special set by Judge Lee, set for 11/17/2021 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/23/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on September 23, 2021. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr.; Riball, Edmond; Mitchell, Donna Rae. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jr. Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 641738. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport's Answer To Complaint filed by Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport, an individual and business entity. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received by an Miguel Rubio Rojo dba M R Transport in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 639658. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/23/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mitchell, Donna Rae; Riball, Edmond; Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr.; Riball, Isabel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Colin Jones, retained for Donna Rae Mitchell . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Colin Jones, retained for Edmond Riball . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Colin Jones, retained for Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr. . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mitchell, Donna Rae; Riball, Edmond; Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell, Jr.; Riball, Isabel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jr. Michael Mitchell individually and as the successor in interest to Frankie Joe Mitchell in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 632329. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K.