This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 13:58:45 (UTC).

Michael Merriweather vs Samuel Castillo et al.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Michael Merriweather filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Samuel Castillo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9832

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merriweather, Michael

Defendants

Castillo, Guadualupe

Castillo, Samuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osgood, Warren

 

Court Documents

UD105 Answer

ANSWER First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Castillo, Guadualupe. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Order on ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Order for Temporary Stay as to Samuel Castillo Granted and filed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

UD105 Answer

ANSWER First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Castillo, Samuel. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default as to All Occupants - Civil filed by Merriweather, Michael. ENTERED Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Guadualupe Castillo served on 08/14/2018 by Personal Service. $42.50. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 09/06/2018 01:30 PM . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Notice of Hearing - Unlawful Detainer Trial

Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 09/06/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department 3A. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Guadualupe Castillo. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Samuel Castillo. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Samuel & Guadualupe Castillo served on 09/26/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Temporary Stay as to Samuel Castillo Granted and filed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Castillo, Samuel. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Castillo, Samuel. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Payment received by Warren Osgood in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 334645. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Samuel Castillo and Guadualupe Castillo on 09/11/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • entered and filed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Merriweather, Michael. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Castillo, Guadualupe. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Merriweather, Michael. $42.50. 08/11/2018. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Attorney, Warren Osgood, retained for Michael Merriweather . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Merriweather, Michael. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Merriweather, Michael. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Payment received by Michael Merriweather in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 323662. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less