This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 15:18:04 (UTC).

Michael Dunn et al. vs Cal Raymond Branyan et al.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2016 Michael Dunn filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Cal Raymond Branyan. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6637

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dunn, Michael

Dunn, Paula

Defendants

Branyan, Cal Raymond

Pardini, Amy Elizabeth

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Cal Raymond Branyan and Amy Elizabeth Pardini served on 08/10/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Michael Dunn, Paula Dunn against Cal Raymond Branyan, Amy Elizabeth Pardini filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Cal Raymond Branyan, Amy Elizabeth Pardini Denied previously entered 7/20/2016 Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Cal Raymond Branyan Entered Judge: Urie, Phillip.

entry of default

Request for Default against Amy Elizabeth Pardini Entered Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Cal Raymond Branyan served on 07/12/2016 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Amy Elizabeth Pardini served on 07/09/2016 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service by Mail and posting all Occupants c/o Amy Elizabeth Pardini - Civil filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

MC010 Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Notice that You Have Been Sued

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Cal Raymond Branyan and Amy Elizabeth Pardini served on 08/10/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Payment received by Michael Dunn in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 83735. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Michael Dunn, Paula Dunn against Cal Raymond Branyan, Amy Elizabeth Pardini filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Cal Raymond Branyan, Amy Elizabeth Pardini Denied previously entered 7/20/2016 Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Cal Raymond Branyan Entered Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Amy Elizabeth Pardini Entered Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail and posting all Occupants c/o Amy Elizabeth Pardini - Civil filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Amy Elizabeth Pardini served on 07/09/2016 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Cal Raymond Branyan served on 07/12/2016 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Payment received by Erlanzson in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 77689. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dunn, Paula; Dunn, Michael. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less