This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 07:47:05 (UTC).

Michael Basso vs Lisa C Basso

Case Summary

On 01/27/2016 Michael Basso filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Lisa C Basso. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0377

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Basso, Michael

Respondent

Basso, Lisa C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Lisa C Basso filed. Served on 02/02/2016. Method of Service: Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Basso, Michael. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Basso, Michael. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Basso, Lisa C. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Basso, Michael. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Basso, Michael. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Basso, Lisa C. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketRequest for Default against Lisa C Basso Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 26116. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Pro Per, retained for Michael Basso . Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Basso, Michael. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less