This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/26/2018 at 14:31:08 (UTC).

Meritage Homes Corporation vs. Sacramento A1 Door, Inc

Case Summary

On 07/02/2013 Meritage Homes Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sacramento A1 Door, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6671

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Court Documents

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Meritage Homes Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address filed by Meritage Homes Corporation; Meritage Homes Of California, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Sacramento Insulation Contractors dba Scaramento Building Products filed by Sacramento Insulation Contractors, Inc,. Action Type: Notice of Settlement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Payment Receipt

10/21/2013: Payment Receipt

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to B.C. Electric. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Hutton Lovewell, Inc.. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Application for Good Faith Settlement

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Sacramento Insulation Contractors, Inc,. Action Type: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Sacramento Insulation Contractors, Inc,. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Pacheco Tractor Service, Inc.. Judge: Ross, Roger.

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2016
  • DocketElizabeth Humphreys Assigned. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Meritage Homes Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Sacramento A-1 Door, Meritage Homes Corporation, Meritage Homes Of California, Inc., Sacramneto A1 Door, Inc, Achrotech, Inc., Alpine Construction & Roofing, Inc., Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc., Artistic Stone Fabrication, Inc., Birchwood Cabinets Of California, Inc., Builder Showcase Interiors, Inc. (Bsi), Budget Drywall, California Mantel, Inc., Chambers Glass, Sharcar Enterprises, Inc., Custom Window Supply, Inc., Enterprise Construction, Ernie'S Quality Concrete, Fields Construction Services, Inc,, Garcia & Sons Contrete, Inc., General Electric, G&S Shower Pans, Inc., Humphrey Plumbing, Inc., Ideal Living Systems, Inc., Iron Works, Mid Valley Plastering, Norman Masonry, Inc., Owens Corning Sales, Inc., Petersen Dean, Inc., Precision Industries Solid Surface & Milwork, Inc., Rangel Drywall, Inc., Scheer Security Alarm Systems, Inc., Selectbuild Northern California, Inc., Davis & Davis, Inc., Sturdy Fence Company, Inc., Tomas Lighting Company, Inc., Western Shower Door Inc., Enterprize Construction & Garage Door, Inc., Moes 1-100, Lorenzo Hernandez, American Trim Company Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to McBay Tile, Inc., a California corporation, Ahling Fireplace Products, Inc., G&G Construction Management, Lp. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Meritage Homes Of California, Inc.; Meritage Homes Corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Meritage Homes Of California, Inc.; Meritage Homes Corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Pacheco Tractor Service, Inc.. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with prejudice as to Pacheco Tractor Service, Inc., a California corporation ONLY filed by Meritage Homes Corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Meritage Homes Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
893 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketAddress for Edward Huguenin selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketAutomatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketAutomatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 12/02/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Holland, Lesley. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Meritage Homes Corporation; Meritage Homes of California, Inc. on 07/02/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Meritage Homes Corporation; Meritage Homes of California, Inc. on 07/02/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed by Meritage Homes Corporation; Meritage Homes of California, Inc. on 07/02/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less