This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 00:22:24 (UTC).

Melber Tucker et al. vs The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 Melber Tucker filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7927

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tucker, Kathryn

Tucker, Melber

Defendants

Donahoo Roofing

The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Niermeyer, Lawrence T

Defendant Attorneys

Krmpotic, Joy Stephanie

Dye, Peter W

Redfield, Charles Scranton

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/24/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing - Civil Jury Trial

Hearing regarding: Jury Trial , set for 02/25/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 01/28/2019 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Donahoo Roofing; The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Donahoo Roofing. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.; Donahoo Roofing. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Tucker, Kathryn; Tucker, Melber. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Association of Counsel

Notice of Association of Counsel filed by The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.; Donahoo Roofing. Action Type: Association of Counsel; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Answer

Answer..... filed by Donahoo Roofing. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Answer

Defendant The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.'s Unverified Answer to Unverified Complaint filed by The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS015 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt-Civil

Proof of Service of Summons as to The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc. served on 08/29/2017 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Donahoo Roofing served on 08/11/2017 by Personal Service. $95.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Tucker, Kathryn; Tucker, Melber. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tucker, Kathryn; Tucker, Melber. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial , set for 02/25/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 01/28/2019 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on January 24, 2018. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/24/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Payment received by Inc. The Home Depot At-Home Services and Donahoo Roofing in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 253425. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by Donahoo Roofing; The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Donahoo Roofing. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by The Home Depot At-Home Services, Inc.; Donahoo Roofing. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Tucker, Kathryn; Tucker, Melber. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Donahoo Roofing served on 08/11/2017 by Personal Service. $95.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/24/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Attorney, Lawrence T Niermeyer, retained for Kathryn Tucker . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Attorney, Lawrence T Niermeyer, retained for Melber Tucker . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Payment received by Melber Tucker in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 194130. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Tucker, Kathryn; Tucker, Melber. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tucker, Kathryn; Tucker, Melber. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIERMEYER LAWRENCE