This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:35:02 (UTC).

Mehwish Khan vs Tahir Khan

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Mehwish Khan filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Tahir Khan. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0862

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Khan, Mehwish

Respondent

Khan, Tahir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Roxson, Randy Dale

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on April 1, 2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial-Child Custody held on April 1, 2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial-Child Support held on April 1, 2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial-Spouse Support held on April 1, 2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 04/01/2016 08:15 AM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • AMENDED Notice of Limited Scope Represenation filed by Khan, Mehwish. Action Type: Notice of Limited Scope Represenation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Tahir Khan filed. Served on 03/01/2016. Method of Service: Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial-Spouse Support , set for 04/01/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial-Child Support , set for 04/01/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial-Child Custody , set for 04/01/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO Child Custody, Child Support, Visitation, Spousal Support, set for 04/01/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice of Limited Scope Represenation filed by Khan, Mehwish. Action Type: Notice of Limited Scope Represenation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 33819. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • RFO-Request for Order filed by Khan, Mehwish. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Khan, Mehwish. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Randy Dale Roxson, retained for Mehwish Khan . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 33819. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less