This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 05:54:23 (UTC).

Mehrdad Michael Azari et al. vs Melvin Wilson et al.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2016 Mehrdad Michael Azari filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Melvin Wilson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0770

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Azari, Mehrdad Michael

Defendants

Wilson, Melvin

Miller, Selina

Assignee

Acclaim Credit Technologies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wood, Chad J.

Assignee Attorney

Koch, Steven M.

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer: Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Mehrdad Michael Azari against Melvin Wilson, Selina Miller filed and entered. Judgment includes All Unknown Occupants. Pre Judgment Claim was served. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Selina Miller served on 01/28/2016. Type of Service Personal. $35.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

EJ125 Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination filed by Acclaim Credit Technologies. Action Type: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $196.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $1,029.60 filed by Acclaim Credit Technologies. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $836.55 filed by Acclaim Credit Technologies. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Acclaim Credit Technologies. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Mehrdad Michael Azari against Melvin Wilson, Selina Miller in the amount of $2700.00 Past-due rent, $1705.00 Holdover damages, $300.00 Attorney fees, $515.00 Costs for total judgment amount of $5220.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael as to All Unknown Occupants - entered Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Appearance and Examination of Judgment , set for 08/30/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department M2. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $196.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $1,029.60 filed by Acclaim Credit Technologies. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination filed by Acclaim Credit Technologies. Action Type: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Payment received by Acclaim Credit Technologies in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 299775. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Melvin Wilson and Selina Miller on 03/26/2018 to San Francisco County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Payment received by Acclaim Credit Technologies in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 276877. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Payment received by Acclaim Credit Technologies in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 276877. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Attorney, Steven M. Koch, retained for Acclaim Credit Technologies . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Acclaim Credit Technologies. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. as to All Unknown Occupants. Served by leaving copy with tenant, posting and mailing on 1/28/2016. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Selina Miller served on 01/28/2016. Type of Service Personal. $35.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Melvin Wilson served on 01/28/2016. Type of Service Personal. $35.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 25776. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Azari, Mehrdad Michael. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Attorney, Chad J. Wood, retained for Mehrdad Michael Azari . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less