This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/16/2019 at 06:25:50 (UTC).

Mavis M Cook vs American Medical Response, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Mavis M Cook filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Medical Response, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Other - Voided.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2269

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Voided

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mavis M. Cook, Surviving Spouse of Donald Denton Cook, Sr, "Decedent",

Defendants

Overholt, Scott M

American Medical Response, Inc.

Gerlack, Brent R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chigbu, Clifford C

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Brent R Gerlack served on 09/23/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Scott M Overholt served on 10/18/2019 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

09/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cook, Mavis M. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cook, Mavis M. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to American Medical Response, Inc. served on 09/25/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice to Filing Party

12/04/2019: Notice to Filing Party

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Voided. Case opended in error. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Brent R Gerlack served on 09/23/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to American Medical Response, Inc. served on 09/25/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Scott M Overholt served on 10/18/2019 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/20/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cook, Mavis M. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cook, Mavis M. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Mavis Cook in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 474111. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Clifford C Chigbu, retained for Mavis M Cook . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.