This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 12:05:19 (UTC).

Maryanne Bergstrom vs General Motors, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Maryanne Bergstrom filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1207

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bergstrom, Maryanne

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dolin, Tionna

Defendant Attorney

Kay, Ryan

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Bergstrom, Maryanne.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bergstrom, Maryanne.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC served on 12/06/2022 by Personal Service. $34.00.

Answer

General Motors LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint --- First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by General Motors, LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Maryanne Bergstrom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Ryan Kay, retained for General Motors, LLC .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Motors LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint --- First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by General Motors, LLC.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketPayment received by LLC General Motors in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 801554.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC served on 12/06/2022 by Personal Service. $34.00.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/06/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bergstrom, Maryanne.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Bergstrom, Maryanne.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Maryanne Bergstrom in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 793421.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Tionna Dolin, retained for Maryanne Bergstrom .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kay, Ryan