This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 00:18:15 (UTC).

Mary Munoz vs Dina Belvedere

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Mary Munoz filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against Dina Belvedere. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez, Danielle Y.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************6118

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez, Danielle Y.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Munoz, Mary

Respondent

Belvedere, Dina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pacheco, Frank M

Respondent Attorney

Khan, Saveel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Munoz, Mary.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 4B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Danielle Y. Ramirez; Participants; Dina Belvedere (Respondent); Mary Munoz (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 4B; Result: Held; Judge: Danielle Y. Ramirez; Participants; Dina Belvedere (Respondent); Mary Munoz (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDismissal-Other-Filing Denied as of 12/30/2022; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on December 30, 2022.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/30/2022 10:00 AM .; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Belvedere, Dina.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Saveel Khan, retained for Dina Belvedere .; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Mary Munoz, Dina Belvedere.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Elder Abuse (Mary Munoz), set for 12/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Domestic Violence Restraining Order held on 12/14/2022 08:15 AM .; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of EA-109, EA-110, EA-100 as to Dina Belvedere served on 11/23/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order Elder Abuse (Mary Munoz) *NO POS, set for 12/14/2022 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Danielle Y. Ramirez in Department 4B.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 11/23/2022.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Mary Munoz.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Ex Parte Application.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Elder Abuse or Dependent Abuse Restraining Order filed by Munoz, Mary.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Ramirez, Danielle Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Khan, Saveel