This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/04/2019 at 05:18:28 (UTC).

Mary Barnes vs. Ryland Homes of California Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/31/2013 Mary Barnes filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Ryland Homes of California Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0955

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 02/25/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice- Entire Action as to Mary Barnes, Ryland Homes Of California Inc., Gary Abad, Maflorita Abad, Harold Alimboyoguen, Jocelyn Alimboyoguen, Yvonne Boyd, Rolando Canuto, Cecilia Canuto, Esther Carrarini, Catalina Cavicchia, Alvaro Cruz, Eva Cruz, Francisco Farinha, Tonya Farinha, Neal Fornaciari, Kathleen Fornaciari, Jeanette Gibson, Michael Guasch, Ana Guasch, Michael Guerra, Carrie Guerra, Russell Heilig, Ricardo Hinojosa, Carina Hinojosa, Robert Johannsen, Patricia Johannsen, Marvin Johnson, Gilbert Jones, Shiv Kalia, Meenakshi Kalia, Luella Kammen, Nuronn King, Kimberly King, Ronald Linnebur, Lori Linnebur, Baljit Mangat, Hugo Medrano, Rosario Medrano, Scott Mitchell, Cheryl Mitchell, Nathan Moore, Jennifer Moore, Judy Nielsen, Romulo Pulmano, Myrna Pulmano, Rowel Ramil, Rudy Santos, Darlene Santos, Erik Sapone, Nanette Sapone, Daniel Schermerhorn, Gloria Schermerhorn, Shahzad Shafi, Lubna Shafi, Phuong Tran, Dang Tran, Gary Vierra, Gloria Vierra, Gregg Witcosky, Debbie Witcosky, Timothy Brewer, Shanika Brewer, Clarence Gilbert, Myrna Gilbert, Quy Ho, Kenny Lai, Mary Lai, Constante Luis, Myrna Luis, Chetan Mrutyunjaya, Manjula Mrutyunjaya, Mohan Muthukumarasamy, Michael Romero, Leticia Romero, Jason Smith, Brian Vejby, Roes 1-500, Bruce A Edwards, Robin Narducci, Nicole Chiunti, Syble Clark, Leslie Hayden, Wesley Woolbright, Margaret Woolbright Entered. As to Plaintiffs' Complaint and All Amended Complaints. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/30/2015 08:30 AM. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Minute Order

04/01/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

08/28/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

05/01/2015: Minute Order

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

10/31/2013: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

06/11/2014: Payment Receipt

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice of Cross-Complaint filed by Ryland Homes of California, Inc. - Participant entered as to Ryland Homes Of California Inc., Roes 1-500. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address filed by Ryland Homes Of California Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketCase status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice- Entire Action as to Mary Barnes, Ryland Homes Of California Inc., Gary Abad, Maflorita Abad, Harold Alimboyoguen, Jocelyn Alimboyoguen, Yvonne Boyd, Rolando Canuto, Cecilia Canuto, Esther Carrarini, Catalina Cavicchia, Alvaro Cruz, Eva Cruz, Francisco Farinha, Tonya Farinha, Neal Fornaciari, Kathleen Fornaciari, Jeanette Gibson, Michael Guasch, Ana Guasch, Michael Guerra, Carrie Guerra, Russell Heilig, Ricardo Hinojosa, Carina Hinojosa, Robert Johannsen, Patricia Johannsen, Marvin Johnson, Gilbert Jones, Shiv Kalia, Meenakshi Kalia, Luella Kammen, Nuronn King, Kimberly King, Ronald Linnebur, Lori Linnebur, Baljit Mangat, Hugo Medrano, Rosario Medrano, Scott Mitchell, Cheryl Mitchell, Nathan Moore, Jennifer Moore, Judy Nielsen, Romulo Pulmano, Myrna Pulmano, Rowel Ramil, Rudy Santos, Darlene Santos, Erik Sapone, Nanette Sapone, Daniel Schermerhorn, Gloria Schermerhorn, Shahzad Shafi, Lubna Shafi, Phuong Tran, Dang Tran, Gary Vierra, Gloria Vierra, Gregg Witcosky, Debbie Witcosky, Timothy Brewer, Shanika Brewer, Clarence Gilbert, Myrna Gilbert, Quy Ho, Kenny Lai, Mary Lai, Constante Luis, Myrna Luis, Chetan Mrutyunjaya, Manjula Mrutyunjaya, Mohan Muthukumarasamy, Michael Romero, Leticia Romero, Jason Smith, Brian Vejby, Roes 1-500, Bruce A Edwards, Robin Narducci, Nicole Chiunti, Syble Clark, Leslie Hayden, Wesley Woolbright, Margaret Woolbright Entered. As to Plaintiffs' Complaint and All Amended Complaints. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Abad, Gary and all other Plaintiffs. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Barnes, Mary. Entire Action Dismissed on 03/29/2016. NOT ENTERED. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice of Cross-Complaint filed by Ryland Homes of California, Inc. - Participant entered as to Ryland Homes Of California Inc., Roes 1-500. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Ryland Homes Of California Inc.. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice Without Prejudice - *As to Plaintiffs Complaint & Amended Complaints **ONLY** Each party to bear its own fees & costs. - Participant entered as to Harold Alimboyoguen, Jocelyn Alimboyoguen, Nuronn King, Kimberly King, Nathan Moore, Jennifer Moore, Phuong Tran, Dang Tran, Gregg Witcosky, Debbie Witcosky, Constante Luis, Myrna Luis, Chetan Mrutyunjaya, Manjula Mrutyunjaya, Michael Romero, Leticia Romero, Wesley Woolbright, Margaret Woolbright. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
599 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketStatus of Myrna Pulmano updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketStatus of Maflorita Abad updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketStatus of Gary Abad updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketComplaint updated 10/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 04/01/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in 42 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer McNatt, Bob. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Barnes, Mary on 10/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barnes, Mary on 10/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed by Barnes, Mary on 10/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less