Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:37:40 (UTC).

Maritza De La Rosa vs. State of California, Department of Transportation (Caltrans)

Case Summary

On 06/04/2015 Maritza De La Rosa filed an Other lawsuit against State of California, Department of Transportation Caltrans. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Humphreys, Elizabeth and Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5063

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Humphreys, Elizabeth

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

De La Rosa, Maritza

Maritza De La Rosa

De La Rosa, Diana

Plaintiff and Petitioner

De La Rosa, Maritza

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

State of California, Department of Transportation (Caltrans)

State Board Of Contral Of The State Of California

The State of California

Chrysler Motor Company, the manufacturer of VOLVO

State Board Of Control Of The State Of California

YRC Worldwide, Inc.

Stockton Honda, a California Corporation

WABASH, the manufacturer of WHI Fifty Three Foot Box Van

Nunes, Daniel Lawrence

American Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation

Hyundai Motor Company

State of California

YRC, dba Roadway Express, Inc.

Wabash Incorporated

YRC Freight

YRC, Inc.

Department Of Transportation (Caltrans)

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Guardian Ad Litem

De La Rosa, Diana

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner, Cross Defendant and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

Babitzke, Michael F

De Saint Phalle, Eustace

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelly, Steven T

Watkins, Norman J

Other Attorneys

Kelleher, Thomas R.

Silverstein, Jenny Anne

Leonard, Bruce E

Latchaw, Jill H.

McCarthy, Ryan Alexander

D'Oyen, Marlon

Stinnett, Jennifer K.

Bullard, James Edward

 

Court Documents

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by American Honda Motor Co, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 09/27/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by California Department of Transportation (Caltrans). Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Request for Judicial Notice

Defendant's Castillo's Request for Judicial Notice filed by Castillo, Jose Rolando. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Defendant's Notice of and Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP Section 877.6(a)(2))

Defendant's Notice of and Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP Section 877.6(a)(2)) filed by Castillo, Jose Rolando. Action Type: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice to Filing Party

03/24/2017: Notice to Filing Party

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant State of California, Department of Transportation's Demurrer to Amended Complaint filed by State of California, Department Of Transportation (Caltrans). Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint filed by De La Rosa, Diana; De La Rosa, Maritza. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Opposition

Defendant, Department of Transportation (Caltrans) Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Attendance of Caltrans person most qualified; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Marlon D'Oyen in Support thereof filed by California Department of Transportation (Caltrans) and R & L Brosamer Inc. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Diana De La Rosa, as conservator of the conservatorship of Maritza De La Rosa,. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Amendment to Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complainants YRC Inc., DBA YRC Freight and Daniel Lawrence Nunes' Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious Name - Roe 1) filed by YRC Worldwide, Inc.; Nunes, Daniel Lawrence; YRC Inc. dba YRC Freight. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Farwest Safety, Inc. served on 10/24/2017 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Supplemental Declaration

Supplemental Declaration of Michael F. Babitzke in Support of Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Diana De La Rosa, as conservator of the conservatorship of Maritza De La Rosa,; De La Rosa, Diana. Action Type: Supplemental Declaration - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration in Support

Declaration in Support in Finding a good Faith Settlement filed by De La Rosa, Diana. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Cross-Complaint

Defendants and Cross-Complaint s YRC, Inc., DBA YRC Freight, and Daniel Lawrence Nunezs' Cross Complaint filed by Nunez, Daniel Lawrence; YRC Inc. dba YRC Freight. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by State of California. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem / Conservator filed by Maritza De La Rosa, Diana De La Rosa. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

593 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order filed by Chrisp Company. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address filed by De La Rosa, Diana; Diana De La Rosa, as conservator of the conservatorship of Maritza De La Rosa,. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Defendant State of California, Department of Transportation's Second Amended Answer to the Second Amended Complaint of Diana De La Rosa, individually and Diana De La Rosa, as Conservatorship of Maritza De La Rosa filed by State of California Department Of Transportation (Caltrans). Action Type: Amended; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Regarding The State of California Department of Transportation's Motion for Leave to 1. File a Second Amended Answer and 2. File a Cross-Complaint filed by State of California Department Of Transportation (Caltrans). Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Miscellaneous Hearing , set for 03/02/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Miscellaneous Hearing Special Set J/Mulvihill - The Court will use this hearing to set dates on on previously continued (by the Court) Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. See M/O of 03/28/2019 for specific details -, set for 06/24/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Hearing re: Miscellaneous Hearing held on June 24, 2019. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 06/17/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Miscellaneous Hearing Special Set J/Mulvihill - The Court will use this hearing to set dates on on previously continued (by the Court) Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. See M/O of 03/28/2019 for specific details - Check w/J. Gerlomes for dates scheduled on 06/17/2019 at 8:30 AM has been Continued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by OC Jones & Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
830 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2015
  • Payment received for 194 - Complaint or other 1st paper in the amount of 435.00 on 06/04/2015, transaction number 1509728 and receipt number 401018. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 06/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Petition - Other (case initiation) (to petition for relief from claim requirment) associated on 06/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Notice of Hearing (to petition for relief from claim requirment) filed by De La Rosa, Maritza on 06/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Application - Other (for leave to present late claim) filed by De La Rosa, Maritza on 06/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice filed by De La Rosa, Maritza on 06/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lofthus, Linda. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Petition - Other (case initiation) filed by De La Rosa, Maritza on 06/04/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YRC WORLDWIDE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MOTORS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant