This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:16:15 (UTC).

Maricielo Lopez et al. vs San Joaquin Regional Transit District et al.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 Maricielo Lopez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against San Joaquin Regional Transit District. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2755

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lopez, Maricielo

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Lovato, Robert

San Joaquin Regional Transit District

MV Transportation, Inc.

MV Transportation, Inc. (Doe 1)

Lovato, Roberto

Lovato, Roberto *

San Joaquin Regional Transit District ^

Lovato, Robert ^

MV Transportation, Inc (Roe 1) *

Turner, Damon (Roe 2) *

San Joaquin Regional Transit District *

Defendant and Other

MV Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jaime, Maria C.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Leonard, Bruce E

Smith, Kevin D.

Disharoon, Steven R.

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action Cross-Complaint filed by San Joaquin Regional Transit District ^ Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Notice of Settlement held on 06/26/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 04/03/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to MV Transportation, Inc. served on 07/03/2018 by Personal Service. $35.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amendment to Cross-Complaint

Amendment to Cross-Complaint for Indemnity (ROES 1 & 2) filed by Lovato, Robert. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amendment to Cross-Complaint

Amendment to Cross-Complaint for Indemnity (ROE 1) filed by Lovato, Roberto. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to San Joaquin Regional Transit District served on 05/04/2017 by Mailing. $0.00. on X-Complaint filed 4/21/17 Judge: Ross, Roger.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint For Indemnity filed by Lovato, Roberto. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer To Complaint filed by Lovato, Roberto. (erroneously sued as Robert Lovato) Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Filing as to Maricielo Lopez, San Joaquin Regional Transit District, Robert Lovato, MV Transportation, Inc. (Doe 1) Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lopez, Maricielo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lopez, Maricielo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Naming Doe 1 as MV Transportation, Inc. ) filed by Lopez, Maricielo. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by San Joaquin Regional Transit District. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lopez, Maricielo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to San Joaquin Regional Transit District served on 03/30/2017 by Personal Service. $69.50. Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM110 Summons - Cross Complaint

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint -Personal injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death filed by Lopez, Maricielo. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action Cross-Complaint filed by San Joaquin Regional Transit District ^ Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Cross complaint of Roberto Lovato, San Joaquin Regional Transit District *, MV Transportation, Inc (Roe 1) *, Damon (Roe 2) * Turner Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Filing as to Maricielo Lopez, San Joaquin Regional Transit District, Robert Lovato, MV Transportation, Inc. (Doe 1) Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Notice of Settlement held on 06/26/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/28/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Hearing re: CMC: Notice of Settlement held on June 26, 2019. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Notice of Settlement , set for 06/26/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Defendant San Joaquin Regional Transit District's Answer to Complaint filed by San Joaquin Regional Transit District. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Payment received by San Joaquin Regional Transit District in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 161733. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/18/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Attorney, Maria C. Jaime, retained for Maricielo Lopez . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Maricielo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Payment received by Maricielo Lopez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 152879. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint -Personal injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death filed by Lopez, Maricielo. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less