Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 22:00:50 (UTC).

Maria Sanchez vs Alejandro Cornejo et al.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2016 Maria Sanchez filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Alejandro Cornejo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0769

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez, Maria

Defendants

Ramirez, Carisma

Cornejo, Alejandro

 

Court Documents

EJ130 Writ of Execution

Writ of Possession as to Carisma Ramirez served on 11/29/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Maria Sanchez against Alejandro Cornejo, Carisma Ramirez filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Alejandro Cornejo, Carisma Ramirez Entered INCLUDES ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Alejandro Cornejo, Carisma Ramirez Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Alejandro Cornejo, Carisma Ramirez Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Alejandro Cornejo served on 10/24/2016 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Carisma Ramirez served on 10/24/2016 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Carisma Ramirez served on 11/29/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Writ of Possession as to Alejandro Cornejo served on 11/29/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Carisma Ramirez on 11/07/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Alejandro Cornejo on 11/07/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Maria Sanchez against Alejandro Cornejo, Carisma Ramirez filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Payment received by Theda Jo Erlandson in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 117786. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Alejandro Cornejo, Carisma Ramirez Entered INCLUDES ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Alejandro Cornejo served on 10/24/2016 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Alejandro Cornejo, Carisma Ramirez Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Maria. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Payment received by Maria Sanchez in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 114003. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less