Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 13:55:29 (UTC).

Maria Reyna et al. vs John Silva Reis et al.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2017 Maria Reyna filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against John Silva Reis. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1438

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Guardian Ad Litems

Reyna, Maria

Solis, Adriana

Solozano, Israel

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Reis, John Silva

Plaintiff and Minor

Solozano, Israel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Guardian Ad Litem and Minor Attorney

Carrillo, Rafael

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Hutchison, Andrew M.

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 04/27/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Cross-Defendant's Answer to Cross-Complaint filed by Solis, Adriana; Solozano, Israel; Reyna, Maria. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Reis, John Silva; Reis, John Silva. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint of John Silva Reis filed by Reis, John Silva. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Defendant John Silva Reis' Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Reis, John Silva. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

AMENDED Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint filed by Solozano, Israel; Reyna, Maria. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Israel Solozano, Maria Reyna. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/11/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Solis, Adriana; Solozano, Israel; Reyna, Maria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to John Silva Reis served on 03/10/2017 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Solis, Adriana; Reyna, Maria; Solozano, Israel. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Solis, Adriana; Reyna, Maria; Solozano, Israel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on April 27, 2018. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 04/27/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Defendant's Answer to Cross-Complaint filed by Solis, Adriana; Solozano, Israel; Reyna, Maria. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 04/27/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on December 13, 2017. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Reis, John Silva; Reis, John Silva. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Attorney, Andrew M. Hutchison, retained for John Silva Reis . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint of John Silva Reis filed by Reis, John Silva. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Solis, Adriana; Solozano, Israel; Reyna, Maria. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to John Silva Reis served on 03/10/2017 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/11/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Attorney, Rafael Carrillo, retained for Adriana Solis, .Maria Reyna and for Israel Solozano . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Solis, Adriana; Reyna, Maria; Solozano, Israel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Solis, Adriana; Reyna, Maria; Solozano, Israel. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Payment received by Maria Reyna in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 142451. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUTCHINSON, ANDREW M.