This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 04:24:46 (UTC).

Maria Morales vs El Concilio California, a California corporation

Case Summary

On 03/10/2023 Maria Morales filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against El Concilio California, a California corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2409

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morales, Maria

Defendant

El Concilio California, a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Manukyan, Edgar

Defendant Attorney

Jimenez, Lisa Blanco

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morales, Maria.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Morales, Maria.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Answer

Defendant El Concilio California's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.

POS050 Proof of Electronic Service

Proof of Electronic Service filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.

cm110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Morales, Maria.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/07/2023 08:30 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Status Hearing; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; El Concilio California, a California corporation (Defendant); Maria Morales (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; El Concilio California, a California corporation (Defendant); Maria Morales (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Status Hearing Re: Mediation, set for 12/11/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/07/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on September 7, 2023.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketPayment received by a El Concilio California in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 862155.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Morales, Maria.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Maria Morales in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 861856.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant El Concilio California's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by El Concilio California, a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketPayment received by a El Concilio California in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 835533.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/07/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Morales, Maria.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morales, Maria.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Maria Morales in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 818309.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Edgar Manukyan, retained for Maria Morales .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less