This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 18:19:26 (UTC).

Maria Leanos et al. vs Ricky L Bowen

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 Maria Leanos filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ricky L Bowen. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3373

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leanos, Maria

Rodriguez, Joel

Defendant

Bowen, Ricky L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Benjamin D

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Leanos, Maria; Rodriguez, Joel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Leanos, Maria; Rodriguez, Joel. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Leanos, Maria; Rodriguez, Joel. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order to Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons as to All Occupants in care of Ricky L Bowen served on 04/13/2018 by Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Leanos, Maria; Rodriguez, Joel. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ricky L Bowen served on 04/13/2018 by Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Ricky L Bowen and All Occupants Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Maria Leanos, Joel Rodriguez against Ricky L Bowen filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. \ Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Ricky L Bowen served on 05/23/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2019

Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2018
View Court Documents

Writ of Possession as to Ricky L Bowen served on 05/23/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2018

Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2018

Writ of Possession issued as to Ricky L Bowen on 05/07/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2018

Payment received by Law Offices of Anthony Drew Rowe in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 290369. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018
View Court Documents

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Maria Leanos, Joel Rodriguez against Ricky L Bowen filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. \ Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018
View Court Documents

Request for Default against Ricky L Bowen and All Occupants Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Leanos, Maria; Rodriguez, Joel. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018
View Court Documents

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Leanos, Maria; Rodriguez, Joel. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018
View Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons as to All Occupants in care of Ricky L Bowen served on 04/13/2018 by Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
04/06/2018

Payment received by Law Office of Anthony Drew Rowe in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 281386. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018
View Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Leanos, Maria; Rodriguez, Joel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018
View Court Documents

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018
View Court Documents

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Leanos, Maria; Rodriguez, Joel. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018

Attorney, Benjamin D Rowe, retained for Maria Leanos . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018

Attorney, Benjamin D Rowe, retained for Joel Rodriguez . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018
View Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018
View Court Documents

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018

Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018

Payment received by G.O.N.E in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 276132. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less