This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 07:11:22 (UTC).

Maria Coria vs. Nancy Rivera

Case Summary

On 10/14/2011 Maria Coria filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Nancy Rivera. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4214

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coria, Maria

Defendants

Rivera, Nancy

Rivera, Elvis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tuitavuki, Tim

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

12/07/2011: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

11/18/2011: Minute Order

Authorization for Property Manager to Commence and Pursue Unlawful Detainer Actions

11/02/2011: Authorization for Property Manager to Commence and Pursue Unlawful Detainer Actions

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

11/02/2011: MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

10/27/2011: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order

10/19/2011: Order

Payment Receipt

10/19/2011: Payment Receipt

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2011: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice that you have been sued

10/14/2011: Notice that you have been sued

EJ130 Writ of Execution

01/03/2012: EJ130 Writ of Execution

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

11/14/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

11/07/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

11/02/2011: UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

UD105 Answer

10/28/2011: UD105 Answer

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

10/27/2011: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Application for Order

10/19/2011: Application for Order

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

10/14/2011: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Payment Receipt

10/14/2011: Payment Receipt

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2012
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2011
  • Case security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • Complaint (signed by Judge Phillip R Urie) associated on 12/07/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • Automatic Cases Awaiting Final Judgment Papers Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • Status of Nancy Rivera updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • Status of Elvis Rivera updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2011
  • Payment received for 171 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 240.00 on 10/14/2011, transaction number 878382 and receipt number 234445. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Address for Maria Coria selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 10/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Coria, Maria on 10/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Coria, Maria on 10/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Complaint filed by Coria, Maria on 10/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tuitavuki, Tim