This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 18:37:23 (UTC).

Marcus Lewis et al. vs Michael Doyle et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 Marcus Lewis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michael Doyle. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger, Scott, W. Stephen and Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1695

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Scott, W. Stephen

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lewis, Marcus

Defendants

Doyle, Victoria

Doyle, Michael

LKQ Auto Parts of Central California, Inc.

Redding Auto Center, Inc.

LKQ Auto Parts of Central California

Intervenor

Sentry Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ebsworth, Phillip J.

Defendant Attorneys

Berry, Mark Emmett

Jacobson, Richard Mark

Intervenor Attorney

Hummer, Edward L

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lewis, Marcus. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

12/13/2018: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael Doyle served on 10/09/2018 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Redding Auto Center, Inc. served on 09/21/2018 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice to Filing Party

03/01/2019: Notice to Filing Party

Answer

Defendants LKQ Auto Parts of Central California, Inc. and Redding Auto Center, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint - First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Redding Auto Center, Inc.; LKQ Auto Parts of Central California, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer to Sentry Causality Company's Workers' Compensation Complaint in Intervention filed by Doyle, Victoria; Doyle, Michael. Action Type: Answer in Intervention; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/18/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Sentry Casualty Company. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 18, 2019. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/18/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial Jury Trial Assignment, set for 04/20/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 03/23/2020 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Mark Emmett Berry, retained for Victoria Doyle . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Mark Emmett Berry, retained for Michael Doyle . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Sentry Causality Company's Workers' Compensation Complaint in Intervention filed by Doyle, Victoria; Doyle, Michael. Action Type: Answer in Intervention; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Doyle, Victoria; Doyle, Michael. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Marcus Lewis in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 394948. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by LKQ Auto Parts of Central California, Inc.; Redding Auto Center, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Redding Auto Center, Inc. served on 09/21/2018 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Complaint Pursuant to California Labor Code 3853 filed by Lewis, Marcus. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Phillip J. Ebsworth, retained for Marcus Lewis . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/18/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lewis, Marcus. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lewis, Marcus. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketPayment received by Marcus Lewis in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 337463. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LKQ AUTO PARTS OF CENTRAL CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where REDDING AUTO CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SENTRY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hummer, Edward L