Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 13:55:43 (UTC).

Marcos Valenzuela et al. vs Angel Ordaz

Case Summary

On 02/14/2017 Marcos Valenzuela filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Angel Ordaz. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1440

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Valenzuela, Fabian

Valenzuela, Marcos

Defendant

Ordaz, Angel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrillo, Rafael

Defendant Attorney

Charter, Brian H.

 

Court Documents

Denied OSC

04/24/2018: Denied OSC

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 04/05/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 04/05/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 04/05/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 02/21/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel held on 02/09/2018 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Valenzuela, Marcos; Valenzuela, Fabian. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MC052 Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Valenzuela, Marcos. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Answer to Complaint

Answer to Complaint filed by Ordaz, Angel. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause re Terminating Sanctions filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice to Filing Party

04/24/2018: Notice to Filing Party

Application

Application to Schedule a Further OSC Regarding Dismissal Hearing filed by Ordaz, Angel. Action Type: Application - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Ordaz, Angel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MC051 Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Motion and Motion to be relieved as counsel - civil filed by Valenzuela, Fabian. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Valenzuela, Fabian; Valenzuela, Marcos. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Valenzuela, Fabian; Valenzuela, Marcos. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valenzuela, Marcos. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause re Terminating Sanctions filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application to Schedule a Further OSC Regarding Dismissal Hearing filed by Ordaz, Angel. Action Type: Application - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 04/05/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 02/26/2020 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Hearing re: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on April 5, 2018. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Hearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on April 5, 2018. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Ordaz, Angel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 02/21/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 04/05/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 04/05/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Valenzuela, Fabian; Valenzuela, Marcos. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/11/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Attorney, Rafael Carrillo, retained for Fabian Valenzuela . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Attorney, Rafael Carrillo, retained for Marcos Valenzuela . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valenzuela, Marcos. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Payment received by Marcos Valenzuela in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 142465. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Valenzuela, Marcos. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrillo, Rafael