This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 08:18:33 (UTC).

Maple Leaf v Tate

Case Summary

On 01/19/2012 Maple Leaf filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tate. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coughlan, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0706

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Coughlan, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maple Leaf Reo And Asset Management Llc A Limited Liability Company

Defendants

Small, Arthur A. Iii

Tate, Ronald E

Tate, Michelle L

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

01/19/2012: Payment Receipt

Notice that you have been sued

01/19/2012: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

01/25/2012: Payment Receipt

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

02/22/2012: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

03/05/2012: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

06/04/2012: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

07/11/2012: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

07/11/2012: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

08/20/2012: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

10/29/2012: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

06/20/2013: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2019

DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Coughlan, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2015

DocketWrit has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2015

DocketWrit of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by Maple Leaf REO and Asset Management LLC a limited liability company on 08/17/2015. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013

DocketTate, Michelle L added as a Defendant effective 08/29/2013. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013

DocketComplaint updated 08/29/2013. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013

DocketThe status of Award2 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013

DocketSatisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed by Maple Leaf REO and Asset Management LLC a limited liability company on 08/26/2013. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2013

DocketWrit has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2013

DocketWrit of Execution Returned (partially satisfied) filed by Maple Leaf REO and Asset Management LLC a limited liability company on 06/27/2013. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2013

DocketPayment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 06/20/2013, transaction number 1182656 and receipt number 313733. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
110 More Docket Entries
01/19/2012

DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketAutomatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketAutomatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketAutomatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketCase assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Maple Leaf REO and Asset Management LLC a limited liability company on 01/19/2012. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Maple Leaf REO and Asset Management LLC a limited liability company on 01/19/2012. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2012

DocketComplaint filed by Maple Leaf REO and Asset Management LLC a limited liability company on 01/19/2012. Judge: CONVERSION,.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less