This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/02/2022 at 11:56:19 (UTC).

Manuel Keo et al. vs Woodside 06N, LP et al.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 Manuel Keo filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Woodside 06N, LP. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4531

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Walsh, Paul Bradley

Schaffer, Todd Allen

Moak, Stacy M.

Tarle, Cynthia Pertile

Rapp, Susan H.

Paige, Robert N.

Cox, Chip

Heath, Stephen Boyd

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Woodside 05N, LP, dba Woodside Homes of Northern California LP, Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc, American Liberty Roofing, Inc Entered.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 04/29/2021 08:30 AM .

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Alcal-Arcade Contracting, Azevedo Painting, Beutler Heating & Air, Inc., Blue Mountain Construction Services, BZ Plumbing Co., Inc., California Mantel, Inc., Carmichael Door, Inc., Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc., Creative Design Interiors, Inc., Energetic Painting & Drywall, Inc., Fenceworks, Inc., Foothill Painting & Drywall, Inc., Framecon, Inc., Gold Star Insulation, LP, Homesite Services, Inc, I Stair, Inc., IKE's Landscape, Inc., Kenyon Plastering of Stockton, Inc., Kenyon Plastering, Inc, Kiwi Stair, Inc., Marble Palace, Inc., Matts Roofing, Inc., Monschein Industries, Inc., Pacific West Excavation, Inc., Rayco Electric, Inc., S. Hafoka Electric, Security by Design, Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc., Sunpower Corporation, Tanner Masonry, Titan Framing, Victory Fire Protection, Warda Glass, Inc., West-Cal Concrete, Inc., Western Insulation, LP.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Filing (Complaint) as to Manuel Keo, Sukhjeet Cheema, Tejinder Kaur, Steven Jaray, Shelly Jaray, Joseph Loprieato, Peggy Loprieato, William Owings, Tricia Owings, Janette Reif, Gary Reif, James Tevis, Margaret Tevis, Puja Yadav, Woodside 06N, LP, Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc., Alex Breasher, Laurie Breahser, Brian Eseed, Amy Eseed, Mario Flores Jr., John Merican, Cathy Merican, Woodside 05N , LP dba Woodside homes of Northern California LP, a California Limited Partnership Surviving Limited Partnership by Merger of Woodside Homes of Central California, Inc., BZ Plumbing Co., Inc. (DOE 201), Matt's Roofing, Inc. (DOE 202), Fenceworks, Inc. (DOE 203), BMC West Corporation (DOE 204), Doorway Manufacturing Co., Inc.(DOE 205), Marble Palace, Inc. (DOE 206), Monschein Industries, Inc. (DOE 207), Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc. (DOE 208), Energetic Painting & Drywall, Inc. (DOE 209), S. Hafoka Electric (DOE 210), RCI Electric, Inc., dba Rayco Electric (DOE 211), Carmichael Door, inc. (DOE 212), Alcal Arcade Contracting, Inc. (DOE 213), Victory Fire Protection (DOE 214), California Mantel, Inc. (DOE 215), Fireside Hearth and Home (DOE 216), Creative Design Interiors, Inc. (DOE 217), Selectbuild Northern California, inc., dba Selectbuild Distribution (DOE 218), West-Cal Concrete, Inc. (DOE 219), Yankee Construction Company, Inc. (DOE 220), Framecon, Inc. (DOE 221), Production Framing, Inc. (DOE 222), Titan Framing (DOE 223), Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc. (DOE 224), Pacific West Excavation, Inc. (DOE 225), Blue Mountain Air, Inc. (DOE 226), Beutler Corportation; Villara Corporation (DOE 227), Gold Star Insulation, L.P. (DOE 228), Western Insulation, LP dba Western Insulation (DOE 229), Ike's Landscape, Inc. (DOE 230), Tanner Masonry (DOE 231), Azevedo Painting (DOE 232), Foothill Painting & Drywall, Inic. (DOE 233), Mercury Performance Plumbing, Inc. (DOE 234), Ace American, Inc. (DOE 235), American Liberty Roofing, Inc. (DOE 236), Pet

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 01/28/2021 08:30 AM .

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Victory Fire Protection.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to John Merican, Cathy Merican ONLY .

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/17/2020 08:30 AM .

Notice of Entry of Order

Kenyon Plastering, Inc.'s Notice of Entry of Order of Settlement and Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Kenyon Plastering, Inc.

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Ace American, Inc. (DOE 235) (Defendant); Alcal Arcade Contracting, Inc. (DOE 213) (Defendant); Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc. (DOE 246) (Defendant); Alcal-Arcade Contracting (Cross-Defendant); Alex Breasher (Plaintiff); American Liberty Roofing, Inc (Cross-Defendant); American Liberty Roofing, Inc. (DOE 236) (Defendant); Amy Eseed (Plaintiff); Anlin Industries (DOE 247) (Defendant); Atmos Corporation, dba Merzon Industries (DOE 248) (Defendant); Azevedo Painting (Cross-Defendant); Azevedo Painting (DOE 232) (Defendant); BF Glass, Inc., dba Fresno Shower Door & Mirror (DOE 239) (Defendant); BMC West Corporation (DOE 204) (Defendant); BZ Plumbing Co., Inc. (Cross-Defendant); BZ Plumbing Co., Inc. (DOE 201) (Defendant); Beutler Corportation; Villara Corporation (DOE 227) (Defendant); Beutler Heating & Air, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Black Diamond Electric, Inc. * (Cross-Defendant); Blue Mountain Air, Inc. (DOE 226) (Defendant); Blue Mountain Construction Services (Cross-Defendant); Brian Eseed (Plaintiff); California Mantel, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); California Mantel, Inc. (DOE 215) (Defendant); Carmichael Door, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Carmichael Door, inc. (DOE 212) (Defendant); Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc. (DOE 224) (Defendant); Cathy Merican (Plaintiff); Creative Design Interiors, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Creative Design Interiors, Inc. (DOE 217) (Defendant); Doorway Manufacturing Co., Inc.(DOE 205) (Defendant); Energetic Painting & Drywall, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Energetic Painting & Drywall, Inc. (DOE 209) (Defendant); Fenceworks, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Fenceworks, Inc. (DOE 203) (Defendant); Fireside Hearth and Home (DOE 216) (Defendant); Foothill Painting & Drywall, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Foothill Painting & Drywall, Inic. (DOE 233) (Defendant); Framecon, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Framecon, Inc. (DOE 221) (Defendant); Gary Reif (Plaintiff); Gold Star Insulation, L.P. (DOE 228) (Defendant); Gold Star Insulation, LP (Cross-Defendant); Grant C. Woodruff (Special Master); Homesite Services, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Homesite Services, Inc. (DOE 240) (Defendant); I Stair, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); IKE's Landscape, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Ike's Landscape, Inc. (DOE 230) (Defendant); Istair, Inc. (DOE 242) (Defendant); James Tevis (Plaintiff); Janette Reif (Plaintiff); John Merican (Plaintiff); Joseph Loprieato (Plaintiff); Kenyon Plastering of Stockton, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Kenyon Plastering of Stockton, Inc. (DOE 244) (Defendant); Kenyon Plastering, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Kiwi Stair, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Kiwi Stair, Inc. (DOE 243) (Defendant); Laurie Breahser (Plaintiff); Manuel Keo (Plaintiff); Marble Palace, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Marble Palace, Inc. (DOE 206) (Defendant); Margaret Tevis (Plaintiff); Mario Flores Jr. (Plaintiff); Matt's Roofing, Inc. (DOE 202) (Defendant); Matts Roofing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Mercury Performance Plumbing, Inc. (DOE 234) (Defendant); Mid Valley Plastering, Inc. (DOE 245) (Defendant); Monschein Industries, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Monschein Industries, Inc. (DOE 207) (Defendant); Pacific West Excavation, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Pacific West Excavation, Inc. (DOE 225) (Defendant); Peggy Loprieato (Plaintiff); Petersen-Dean, Inc. (DOE 237) (Defendant); Production Framing, Inc. (DOE 222) (Defendant); Puja Yadav (Plaintiff); RCI Electric, Inc., dba Rayco Electric (DOE 211) (Defendant); Rayco Electric, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); S. Hafoka Electric (Cross-Defendant); S. Hafoka Electric (DOE 210) (Defendant); Security by Design (Cross-Defendant); Security by Design (DOE 238) (Defendant); Selectbuild Northern California, inc., dba Selectbuild Distribution (DOE 218) (Defendant); Shelly Jaray (Plaintiff); Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc. (DOE 208) (Defendant); Steven Jaray (Plaintiff); Sukhjeet Cheema (Plaintiff); Sunpower Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Sunpower Corporation Systems (DOE 241) (Defendant); Sunpower Corporation, Systems * (Cross-Complainant); Tanner Masonry (Cross-Defendant); Tanner Masonry (DOE 231) (Defendant); Tejinder Kaur (Plaintiff); Titan Framing (Cross-Defendant); Titan Framing (DOE 223) (Defendant); Tricia Owings (Plaintiff); Victory Fire Protection (Cross-Defendant); Victory Fire Protection (DOE 214) (Defendant); Warda Glass, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Warda Glass, Inc. (DOE 249) (Defendant); West-Cal Concrete, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); West-Cal Concrete, Inc. (DOE 219) (Defendant); Western Insulation, LP (Cross-Defendant); Western Insulation, LP dba Western Insulation (DOE 229) (Defendant); William Owings (Plaintiff); Woodside 05N , LP dba Woodside homes of Northern California LP, a California Limited Partnership Surviving Limited Partnership by Merger of Woodside Homes of Central California, Inc. (Defendant); Woodside 05N, LP, dba Woodside Homes of Northern California LP (Cross-Complainant); Woodside 06N, LP (Defendant); Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc (Cross-Complainant); Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc. (Defendant); Yankee Construction Company, Inc. (DOE 220) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Woodside 05N, LP, dba Woodside Homes of Northern California LP, Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc, American Liberty Roofing, Inc Entered.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc; Woodside 05N, LP, dba Woodside Homes of Northern California LP.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Ace American, Inc. (DOE 235) (Defendant); Alcal Arcade Contracting, Inc. (DOE 213) (Defendant); Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc. (DOE 246) (Defendant); Alcal-Arcade Contracting (Cross-Defendant); Alex Breasher (Plaintiff); American Liberty Roofing, Inc (Cross-Defendant); American Liberty Roofing, Inc. (DOE 236) (Defendant); Amy Eseed (Plaintiff); Anlin Industries (DOE 247) (Defendant); Atmos Corporation, dba Merzon Industries (DOE 248) (Defendant); Azevedo Painting (Cross-Defendant); Azevedo Painting (DOE 232) (Defendant); BF Glass, Inc., dba Fresno Shower Door & Mirror (DOE 239) (Defendant); BMC West Corporation (DOE 204) (Defendant); BZ Plumbing Co., Inc. (Cross-Defendant); BZ Plumbing Co., Inc. (DOE 201) (Defendant); Beutler Corportation; Villara Corporation (DOE 227) (Defendant); Beutler Heating & Air, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Black Diamond Electric, Inc. * (Cross-Defendant); Blue Mountain Air, Inc. (DOE 226) (Defendant); Blue Mountain Construction Services (Cross-Defendant); Brian Eseed (Plaintiff); California Mantel, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); California Mantel, Inc. (DOE 215) (Defendant); Carmichael Door, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Carmichael Door, inc. (DOE 212) (Defendant); Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc. (DOE 224) (Defendant); Cathy Merican (Plaintiff); Creative Design Interiors, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Creative Design Interiors, Inc. (DOE 217) (Defendant); Doorway Manufacturing Co., Inc.(DOE 205) (Defendant); Energetic Painting & Drywall, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Energetic Painting & Drywall, Inc. (DOE 209) (Defendant); Fenceworks, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Fenceworks, Inc. (DOE 203) (Defendant); Fireside Hearth and Home (DOE 216) (Defendant); Foothill Painting & Drywall, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Foothill Painting & Drywall, Inic. (DOE 233) (Defendant); Framecon, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Framecon, Inc. (DOE 221) (Defendant); Gary Reif (Plaintiff); Gold Star Insulation, L.P. (DOE 228) (Defendant); Gold Star Insulation, LP (Cross-Defendant); Grant C. Woodruff (Special Master); Homesite Services, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Homesite Services, Inc. (DOE 240) (Defendant); I Stair, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); IKE's Landscape, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Ike's Landscape, Inc. (DOE 230) (Defendant); Istair, Inc. (DOE 242) (Defendant); James Tevis (Plaintiff); Janette Reif (Plaintiff); John Merican (Plaintiff); Joseph Loprieato (Plaintiff); Kenyon Plastering of Stockton, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Kenyon Plastering of Stockton, Inc. (DOE 244) (Defendant); Kenyon Plastering, Inc (Cross-Defendant); Kiwi Stair, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Kiwi Stair, Inc. (DOE 243) (Defendant); Laurie Breahser (Plaintiff); Manuel Keo (Plaintiff); Marble Palace, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Marble Palace, Inc. (DOE 206) (Defendant); Margaret Tevis (Plaintiff); Mario Flores Jr. (Plaintiff); Matt's Roofing, Inc. (DOE 202) (Defendant); Matts Roofing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Mercury Performance Plumbing, Inc. (DOE 234) (Defendant); Mid Valley Plastering, Inc. (DOE 245) (Defendant); Monschein Industries, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Monschein Industries, Inc. (DOE 207) (Defendant); Pacific West Excavation, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Pacific West Excavation, Inc. (DOE 225) (Defendant); Peggy Loprieato (Plaintiff); Petersen-Dean, Inc. (DOE 237) (Defendant); Production Framing, Inc. (DOE 222) (Defendant); Puja Yadav (Plaintiff); RCI Electric, Inc., dba Rayco Electric (DOE 211) (Defendant); Rayco Electric, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); S. Hafoka Electric (Cross-Defendant); S. Hafoka Electric (DOE 210) (Defendant); Security by Design (Cross-Defendant); Security by Design (DOE 238) (Defendant); Selectbuild Northern California, inc., dba Selectbuild Distribution (DOE 218) (Defendant); Shelly Jaray (Plaintiff); Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc. (DOE 208) (Defendant); Steven Jaray (Plaintiff); Sukhjeet Cheema (Plaintiff); Sunpower Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Sunpower Corporation Systems (DOE 241) (Defendant); Sunpower Corporation, Systems * (Cross-Complainant); Tanner Masonry (Cross-Defendant); Tanner Masonry (DOE 231) (Defendant); Tejinder Kaur (Plaintiff); Titan Framing (Cross-Defendant); Titan Framing (DOE 223) (Defendant); Tricia Owings (Plaintiff); Victory Fire Protection (Cross-Defendant); Victory Fire Protection (DOE 214) (Defendant); Warda Glass, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Warda Glass, Inc. (DOE 249) (Defendant); West-Cal Concrete, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); West-Cal Concrete, Inc. (DOE 219) (Defendant); Western Insulation, LP (Cross-Defendant); Western Insulation, LP dba Western Insulation (DOE 229) (Defendant); William Owings (Plaintiff); Woodside 05N , LP dba Woodside homes of Northern California LP, a California Limited Partnership Surviving Limited Partnership by Merger of Woodside Homes of Central California, Inc. (Defendant); Woodside 05N, LP, dba Woodside Homes of Northern California LP (Cross-Complainant); Woodside 06N, LP (Defendant); Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc (Cross-Complainant); Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc. (Defendant); Yankee Construction Company, Inc. (DOE 220) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 04/29/2021 08:30 AM .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 07/08/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on April 29, 2021.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Alcal-Arcade Contracting, Azevedo Painting, Beutler Heating & Air, Inc., Blue Mountain Construction Services, BZ Plumbing Co., Inc., California Mantel, Inc., Carmichael Door, Inc., Cassle Door & Insulation Co., Inc., Creative Design Interiors, Inc., Energetic Painting & Drywall, Inc., Fenceworks, Inc., Foothill Painting & Drywall, Inc., Framecon, Inc., Gold Star Insulation, LP, Homesite Services, Inc, I Stair, Inc., IKE's Landscape, Inc., Kenyon Plastering of Stockton, Inc., Kenyon Plastering, Inc, Kiwi Stair, Inc., Marble Palace, Inc., Matts Roofing, Inc., Monschein Industries, Inc., Pacific West Excavation, Inc., Rayco Electric, Inc., S. Hafoka Electric, Security by Design, Sierra Wes Wall Systems, Inc., Sunpower Corporation, Tanner Masonry, Titan Framing, Victory Fire Protection, Warda Glass, Inc., West-Cal Concrete, Inc., Western Insulation, LP.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
192 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for James Tevis .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for Gary Reif .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for Janette Reif .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for Tricia Owings .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for William Owings .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for Peggy Loprieato .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for Joseph Loprieato .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for Shelly Jaray .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Lauren A. Hamblin, retained for Steven Jaray .; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Ross, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less