This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/28/2019 at 06:38:22 (UTC).

Manu Dhanwantri et al. vs Jacqueline Ayson

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Manu Dhanwantri filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jacqueline Ayson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1148

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dhanwantri, Manu

Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan

Defendant

Ayson, Jacqueline

Other

All Other Occupants

 

Court Documents

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan; Dhanwantri, Manu. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan; Dhanwantri, Manu. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan; Dhanwantri, Manu. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order to Allow Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jacqueline Ayson served on 02/28/2019 by Post & Mail. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 02/28/2019. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Dhanwantri, Manu; Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Jacqueline Ayson, All Other Occupants Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Manu Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan Dhanwantri against Jacqueline Ayson filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • Payment received in the amount of $0.50, receipt number 402804. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Jacqueline Ayson on 03/22/2019 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Payment received by Legal Support Net, Inc. in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 402030. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Manu Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan Dhanwantri against Jacqueline Ayson filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Jacqueline Ayson, All Other Occupants Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan; Dhanwantri, Manu. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Dhanwantri, Manu; Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 02/28/2019. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Jacqueline Ayson served on 02/28/2019 by Post & Mail. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan; Dhanwantri, Manu. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Payment received by Ruchika Dhanwantri in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 392296. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan; Dhanwantri, Manu. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dhanwantri, Ruchika Kanchan; Dhanwantri, Manu. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Payment received by Manu Dhanwantri in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 381581. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less