This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:40:24 (UTC).

Manteca Atherton Associates, LP vs Corina Scott

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Manteca Atherton Associates, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Corina Scott. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1837

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manteca Atherton Associates, LP

Defendant

Scott, Corina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clark, Joshua B

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Corina Scott served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $67.50. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Corina Scott Costs $145.00 Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Manteca Atherton Associates, LP against Corina Scott filed and entered. Judgment includes all occupants. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Service date 02/27/2016, fees $10.00. Complies with ccp 415.46. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Corina Scott Costs $145.00 Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Corina Scott on 03/22/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 42780. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Manteca Atherton Associates, LP against Corina Scott filed and entered. Judgment includes all occupants. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Request for Default against Corina Scott Entered. Including all occupants. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Service date 02/27/2016, fees $10.00. Complies with ccp 415.46. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Corina Scott served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $67.50. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 33972. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Manteca Atherton Associates, LP. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Joshua B Clark, retained for Manteca Atherton Associates, LP . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less