This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 08:22:06 (UTC).

Malina Kokologiannakis vs McKinley L Stine

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Malina Kokologiannakis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against McKinley L Stine. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2316

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Defendant

Stine, McKinley L

Guardian Ad Litem

Kokologiannakis, Malina

Minor

Rivas, Gabriella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Minor Attorney

Petrulakis, Dean

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rivas, Gabriella. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Rivas, Gabriella. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Rivas, Gabriella. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/08/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/08/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

notice of settlement

Notice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Kokologiannakis, Malina. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Unconditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Malina Kokologiannakis, Gabriella Rivas. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to McKinley L Stine, Malina Kokologiannakis, Gabriella Rivas Entered. With Prejudice. Each Party Shall pay their own fees and costs. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to McKinley L Stine, Malina Kokologiannakis, Gabriella Rivas Entered. With Prejudice. Each Party Shall pay their own fees and costs. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Kokologiannakis, Malina. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Case status updated to Conditional Settlement. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Kokologiannakis, Malina. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Unconditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/29/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on September 8, 2016. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/08/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Rivas, Gabriella. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Malina Kokologiannakis, Gabriella Rivas. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/08/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed by Rivas, Gabriella. Action Type: Application - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Dean Petrulakis, retained for Gabriella Rivas . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 38299. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Rivas, Gabriella. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rivas, Gabriella. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less