This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 12:16:16 (UTC).

Maisha Philsos et al. vs Christine Micciche et al.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Maisha Philsos filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Christine Micciche. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7949

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cooper, Tianna

Peterson, Deaira

Philsos, Maisha

Defendants

Equity Management, Inc.

Golden Opportunity Investments, LP

Micciche, Christine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Partiyeli, Jacob O

Defendant Attorney

Aghakhani, Bryan

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Peterson, Deaira; Cooper, Tianna; Philsos, Maisha.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Peterson, Deaira; Cooper, Tianna; Philsos, Maisha.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Equity Management, Inc. served on 09/10/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Christine Micciche served on 09/10/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP served on 10/08/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Equity Management, Inc. served on 10/06/2021 by Personal Service. $40.00.

Declaration

Declaration of Bryan Aghakhani Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 430.041 RE Defendant's Demurrer and Motion to Strike filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Philsos, Maisha; Cooper, Tianna; Peterson, Deaira.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/22/2022 08:30 AM .

CM-110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cooper, Tianna; Philsos, Maisha; Peterson, Deaira.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/19/2022 08:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/15/2022 09:00 AM .

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Christine Micciche (Defendant); Deaira Peterson (Plaintiff); Equity Management, Inc. (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP (Defendant); Maisha Philsos (Plaintiff); Tianna Cooper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Christine Micciche (Defendant); Deaira Peterson (Plaintiff); Equity Management, Inc. (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP (Defendant); Maisha Philsos (Plaintiff); Tianna Cooper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/19/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/15/2022 09:00 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on June 15, 2022.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference To be heard with CV-2021-7748 & CV-2021-7747, set for 06/15/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Christine Micciche (Defendant); Deaira Peterson (Plaintiff); Equity Management, Inc. (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP (Defendant); Maisha Philsos (Plaintiff); Tianna Cooper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/19/2022 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCMC: Further Case Management Conference To be heard with CV-2021-7748 & CV-2021-7747 scheduled on 05/19/2022 at 8:30 AM has been Continued.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Cooper, Tianna; Philsos, Maisha; Peterson, Deaira.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/22/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Peterson, Deaira; Cooper, Tianna; Philsos, Maisha.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Peterson, Deaira; Cooper, Tianna; Philsos, Maisha.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jacob O Partiyeli, retained for Deaira Peterson .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jacob O Partiyeli, retained for Tianna Cooper .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jacob O Partiyeli, retained for Maisha Philsos .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Maisha Philsos in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 673740.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden Oppurtunity Investments LP is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT