This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:29:34 (UTC).

Maegen Franco vs Big Valley Ford, Inc

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 Maegen Franco filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Big Valley Ford, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1719

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Franco, Maegen

Defendants

Big Valley Ford, Inc

Big Valley Ford, Inc. d/b/a Big Valley Ford Lincoln, a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gorham, William J III

Defendant Attorneys

Gorhman, William J III

Boggs, John P

 

Court Documents

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Franco, Maegen. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Big Valley Ford, Inc, Maegen Franco Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATMENT

Case Management Statement filed by Franco, Maegen. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer filed by Big Valley Ford, Inc. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Maegen Franco served on 03/09/2016. Type of Service Personal. $45.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

03/01/2016: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

Peremptory Challenge

02/25/2016: Peremptory Challenge

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Big Valley Ford, Inc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Franco, Maegen. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulated Order Approving Settlement Under Labor Code Private Attorneys' General Act of 2004 entered and filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EH)

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/25/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/18/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Big Valley Ford, Inc. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Peremptory Challenge

Declaration of Prejudice/ Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 GRANTED. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Big Valley Ford, Inc. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Big Valley Ford, Inc. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Franco, Maegen. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Big Valley Ford, Inc, Maegen Franco Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Franco, Maegen. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order filed by Franco, Maegen. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Order Approving Settlement Under Labor Code Private Attorneys' General Act of 2004 entered and filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Payment received by Maegen Franco in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 122520. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/25/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 32822. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 32822. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by Big Valley Ford, Inc. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Big Valley Ford, Inc. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Big Valley Ford, Inc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Attorney, William J Gorhman III, retained for Big Valley Ford, Inc . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/18/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less