Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:03:03 (UTC).

Lyle Arechiga vs Barnard Baguyo

Case Summary

On 12/19/2016 Lyle Arechiga filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Barnard Baguyo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2773

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arechiga, Lyle

Defendant

Baguyo, Barnard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrillo, Rafael

Defendant Attorney

Rushford, James W.

 

Court Documents

Order to Consolidate

Order Following Motion to Consolidate and Assign Lead Action filed by Barnard Baguyo. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Consolidated

Order Following Motion to Consolidate and Assign Lead Action filed by Barnard Baguyo. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate held on 11/08/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration of Hasan B. Shaik in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Assign Lead Action filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Miscellaneous Hearing Plntf's-Notice of Related Case, set for 07/20/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM015 Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Arechiga, Lyle. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Date, Time and Department of Defendant Barnard Baguyo's Motion to Consolidate and Assign Lead Action filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

miscellaneous

10/10/2017: miscellaneous

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Assign Lead Action filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 07/20/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Arechiga, Lyle. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Defendant Barnard Baguyo's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

12/19/2016: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Case associated with case: , STK-CV-UAT-2016-0012721 Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Following Motion to Consolidate and Assign Lead Action filed by Barnard Baguyo. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate held on 11/08/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Hearing re: Motion to Consolidate held on November 8, 2017. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Arechiga, Lyle. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Date, Time and Department of Defendant Barnard Baguyo's Motion to Consolidate and Assign Lead Action filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Defendant Barnard Baguyo's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Baguyo, Barnard. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Barnard Baguyo served on 04/17/2017 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/23/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Attorney, Rafael Carrillo, retained for Lyle Arechiga . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Payment received by Lyle Arechiga in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 127882. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Arechiga, Lyle. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arechiga, Lyle. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rushford, James W.