Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 22:09:29 (UTC).

Lydia Fulton-Vidaurri vs Leiloni Hill et al.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 Lydia Fulton-Vidaurri filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Leiloni Hill. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0879

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia

Defendants

Hill, Leiloni

Finks, Angela

Fedi, Jordan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osgood, Warren

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Jordan Fedi, Leiloni Hill and Angela Finks served on 12/07/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Lydia Fulton-Vidaurri against Leiloni Hill, Jordan Fedi, Angela Finks filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

11/17/2016: Notice to Filing Party

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Angela Finks Entered INCLUDES ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Angela Finks served on 10/28/2016 by Substituted Service. $42.50. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Leiloni Hill, Jordan Fedi Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jordan Fedi served on 10/27/2016 by Personal Service. $20.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Leiloni Hill served on 10/27/2016 by Personal Service. $42.50. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Jordan Fedi, Leiloni Hill and Angela Finks served on 12/07/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Angela Finks on 11/18/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Jordan Fedi on 11/18/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Leiloni Hill on 11/18/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Payment received by Lydia Fulton-Vidaurri in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 120925. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Lydia Fulton-Vidaurri against Leiloni Hill, Jordan Fedi, Angela Finks filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Angela Finks Entered INCLUDES ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default clerk's Judgment filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Leiloni Hill served on 10/27/2016 by Personal Service. $42.50. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Jordan Fedi served on 10/27/2016 by Personal Service. $20.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Attorney, Warren Osgood, retained for Lydia Fulton-Vidaurri . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Payment received by Lydia Fulton-Vidaurri in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 114858. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fulton-Vidaurri, Lydia. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less