This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/06/2020 at 10:33:38 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs Maria D Leon

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria D Leon. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2317

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Leon, Maria D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mandarich, Christopher D

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Maria D Leon Not Entered Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CIV105 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Maria D Leon Not Entered Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Maria D Leon filed by LVNV Funding LLC. $95. Line 5 incomplete Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Maria D Leon filed by LVNV Funding LLC. $95. Line 5 not completed, not sure what date they were served. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Order

Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service (by Posting and Mailing) signed by Judge Abdallah filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Motion for Substitute Service

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint by Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Maria D Leon Not Entered Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Default Judgment filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Maria D Leon filed by LVNV Funding LLC. $95. Line 5 incomplete Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Maria D Leon filed by LVNV Funding LLC. $95. Line 5 not completed, not sure what date they were served. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service (by Posting and Mailing) signed by Judge Abdallah filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received by LVNV Funding LLC in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 497785. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by LVNV Funding LLC in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 474496. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Christopher D Mandarich, retained for LVNV Funding LLC . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.