This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 09:28:04 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs Ashley Broekhoven

Case Summary

On 05/15/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ashley Broekhoven. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4454

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Broekhoven, Ashley

Stockton, CA 95204-1830

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karayan, Sarkis S.

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Ashley Broekhoven. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Ashley Broekhoven. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

PLD-C-010 Answer-Contract

Answer - Contract First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Broekhoven, Ashley. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

07/21/2021: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/18/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ashley Broekhoven served on 06/05/2021 by Personal Service. $73.50. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Ashley Broekhoven (Defendant); Participant: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Ashley Broekhoven. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/18/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Broekhoven, Ashley. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Contract First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Broekhoven, Ashley. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Ashley Broekhoven served on 06/05/2021 by Personal Service. $73.50. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received by LVNV Funding LLC in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 645658. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Sarkis S. Karayan, retained for LVNV Funding LLC . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karayan, Sarkis S