This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:37:25 (UTC).

Lupe Cruz-Tiscareno vs Eduardo Tiscareno

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Lupe Cruz-Tiscareno filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Eduardo Tiscareno. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0883

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cruz-Tiscareno, Lupe

Respondent

Tiscareno, Eduardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ross, David Keith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $30.00, receipt number 303519. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Ex Parte Application for Restoration of Former Name After Entry of Judgment and Order filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Request for Default against Eduardo Tiscareno Entered Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Tiscareno, Eduardo. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Tiscareno, Eduardo. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Cruz-Tiscareno, Lupe. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Cruz-Tiscareno, Lupe. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Cruz-Tiscareno, Lupe. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA) filed by Cruz-Tiscareno, Lupe. Action Type: Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Amended Petition filed by Cruz-Tiscareno, Lupe. Action Type: Amended Petition; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Cruz-Tiscareno, Lupe. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Cruz-Tiscareno, Lupe. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34146. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, David Keith Ross, retained for Lupe Cruz-Tiscareno . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less