Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 22:11:45 (UTC).

Luo Li et al. vs Anjanette Terrado et al.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 Luo Li filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Anjanette Terrado. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0908

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Li, Luo

Wang, Jidu

Defendants

Terrado, Robert

Terrado, Anjanette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hardwick, Robert O

 

Court Documents

EJ130 Writ of Execution

Writ of Possession as to Anjanette Terrado served on 12/06/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Robert Terrado. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Anjanette Terrado. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Luo Li, Jidu Wang against Anjanette Terrado, Robert Terrado filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's judgment filed by Wang, Jidu; Li, Luo. ENTERED AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Li, Luo; Wang, Jidu. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Robert Terrado served on 10/29/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Anjanette Terrado Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Wang, Jidu; Li, Luo. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Order on Ex parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction entered and filed. DENIED. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Terrado, Robert; Terrado, Anjanette. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW001 Request to Waive Court Fees

Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Terrado, Anjanette. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW001 Request to Waive Court Fees

Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Terrado, Robert. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Li, Luo; Wang, Jidu. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Robert Terrado Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wang, Jidu; Li, Luo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Anjanette Terrado served on 12/06/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Writ of Possession as to Robert Terrado served on 12/06/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Ex parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction entered and filed. DENIED. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Anjanette Terrado. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Robert Terrado. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Terrado, Robert. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Terrado, Anjanette. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Terrado, Robert; Terrado, Anjanette. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Robert Terrado on 11/14/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Anjanette Terrado on 11/14/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Anjanette Terrado served on 10/27/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Wang, Jidu; Li, Luo. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Attorney, Robert O Hardwick, retained for Jidu Wang . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Attorney, Robert O Hardwick, retained for Luo Li . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Payment received by Luo Li in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 115042. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Wang, Jidu; Li, Luo. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wang, Jidu; Li, Luo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hardwick, Robert O