This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 09:13:09 (UTC).

Luis Alberto Alvarado Canela vs CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc et al.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Luis Alberto Alvarado Canela filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0162

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto

Defendants

Brock, Paul Christopher

CRST Expedited, Inc

CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc

CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc

Gardner Trucking, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dominguez, Timothy L. Esq.

Defendant Attorney

Gray, Kevin J

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Paul Christopher Brock served on 05/11/2023 by Substituted Service. $99.00.

Answer

Defendants CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc., Gardner Trucking, Inc., CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., CRST Expedited Inc. and Paul Christopher Brock's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Gardner Trucking, Inc; CRST Expedited, Inc; CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc; CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc; Brock, Paul Christopher.

Demand for Jury Trial

Defendants CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc., Gardner Trucking, Inc., CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. and Paul Christopher Brock's Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Gardner Trucking, Inc; Brock, Paul Christopher; CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc; CRST Expedited, Inc; CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc; Brock, Paul Christopher; CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc; Gardner Trucking, Inc; CRST Expedited, Inc.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/07/2023 08:30 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial , set for 07/29/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 07/01/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/07/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on July 7, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by CRST Specialized Transportation, Inc; Brock, Paul Christopher; CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc; Gardner Trucking, Inc; CRST Expedited, Inc.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Inc CRST The Transportation Solution in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 841576.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Timothy L. Dominguez Esq., retained for Luis Alberto Alvarado Canela .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/07/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Alvarado Canela, Luis Alberto.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Luis Alvarado Canela in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 802544.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Daniel J Rafii, retained for Luis Alberto Alvarado Canela .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less